TRIMDON CONCERT BRASS BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a friendly, motivated and progressive brass band. We have a flexible approach to membership and welcome players of varying ages and abilities. We have a training band, offering free tuition and instruments loan. We rehearse and are very active in the local community, representing Trimdon (and the North East) at concerts, civic functions and in competitions (locally and nationally).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 02 August 2017: Standard registration
- 05 November 2024: Funds received from 1160086 FISHBURN ACADEMY BAND
- TRIMDON BRASS (Working name)
- TRIMDON BRASS BAND (Working name)
- TRIMDON CONCERT BRASS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Simpson | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNA WICKS | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNSEY GARRAGHAN | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.89k | £7.47k | £10.55k | £8.20k | £13.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.00k | £2.92k | £11.91k | £8.51k | £10.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 February 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 387 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, IN THE PLAYING OF BRASS INSTRUMENTS AND THEIR APPRECIATION OF BRASS BAND MUSIC. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF BRASS BAND MUSIC AND TO STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Keating Close
Blackhall Colliery
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS27 4QN
- Phone:
- 07761563365
- Email:
- hello@trimdonbrass.com
- Website:
-
trimdonbrass.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window