Financial history BANDON HILL WOODFIELD AND OAKFIELD PSA

Charity number: 1172300
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £35.92k £19.91k £20.36k £45.66k £36.67k
Total expenditure £39.61k £16.05k £13.50k £55.62k £41.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A