Accounts and annual returns 1ST GREAT WYRLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509926
Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 February 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2022 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required