ILEOSTOMY AND INTERNAL POUCH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IA'S PRIMARY AIM IS TO HELP PEOPLE WHO HAVE TO UNDERGO SURGERY WHICH INVOLVES THE REMOVAL OF THEIR COLON (KNOWN AS A COLECTOMY) AND THE CREATION OF EITHER AN ILEOSTOMY OR AN ILEO-ANAL POUCH. IA AIMS TO HELP THEM WITH ALL ASPECTS OF THEIR REHABILITATION, TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE RESEARCH AND TO IMPROVE KNOWLEDGE ABOUT THE MANAGEMENT OF ILEOSTOMIES OR POUCHES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£647,745
Donations and legacies | £410.19k | |
Charitable activities | £93.17k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £144.39k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£759,110
Raising funds | £28.50k | |
Charitable activities | £730.61k | |
Other | £0 |
-£111,365 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £28.50k | |
Charitable expenditure | £730.61k |
People

6 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 2017: Standard registration
- 26 November 2018: Funds received from 1059362 COVENTRY AND DISTRICT IA
- 05 December 2018: Funds received from 1040010 NORTH WEST LANCASHIRE & CUMBRIA IA
- 06 December 2018: Funds received from 1041231 CORNWALL I A
- 07 December 2018: Funds received from 1045054 IA KENT
- 31 December 2018: Funds received from 1037847 THREE COUNTIES IA
- 10 January 2019: Funds received from 1039133 NORTH ESSEX I.A.
- 24 January 2019: Funds received from 1088388 NORTH WALES IA
- 01 March 2019: Funds received from 1040287 WEST HANTS WILTS AND DORSET I.A.
- 14 March 2019: Funds received from 1039353 HUMBERSIDE I A
- 27 March 2019: Funds received from 1038928 NORTH LONDON IA
- 07 May 2019: Funds received from 1078734 AVON IA
- 12 August 2019: Funds received from 1048254 IA GREATER LONDON WEST
- 12 September 2019: Funds received from 1037083 NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND DERBYSHIRE IA
- 02 October 2019: Funds received from 1038830 SOUTH WALES I A
- 03 October 2019: Funds received from 1039256 I A MANCHESTER
- 03 October 2019: Funds received from 1038849 SUSSEX IA
- 10 October 2019: Funds received from 1040504 SHEFFIELD AND ROTHERHAM IA
- 16 October 2019: Funds received from 1042380 BERKS, BUCKS AND OXON IA
- 16 October 2019: Funds received from 1062079 WEST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE I.A.
- 26 October 2019: Funds received from 1047020 LEICESTERSHIRE IA
- 25 May 2021: Funds received from 1040701 EAST LONDON AND SOUTH ESSEX IA
- 22 September 2021: Funds received from 1038326 KETTERING IA
- 29 November 2021: Funds received from 1040699 PETERBOROUGH AND WISBECH IA
- 29 November 2021: Funds received from 1040699 PETERBOROUGH AND WISBECH IA
- 09 November 2022: Funds received from 1037995 NORTHAMPTON IA
- 16 May 2024: Funds received from 1038754 SOUTH EAST LONDON AND WEST KENT IA
- IA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Clifford | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Smart | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brigitte Siefken | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Katte | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Bishop | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
STUART HAY | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Cepta Burke | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sibbald | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNA RENNIE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Usher | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £453.57k | £468.10k | £390.38k | £393.99k | £647.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £626.34k | £488.94k | £544.09k | £615.07k | £759.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £410.19k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £93.17k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £144.39k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £342.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £730.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £204.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.60m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200.59k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £155.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: 2.1.1 TO HELP ANYONE WHOSE COLON HAS BEEN, OR IS ABOUT TO BE, REMOVED BY SURGICAL PROCEDURE OR WHO HAS AN ILEOSTOMY OR AN INTERNAL POUCH; 2.1.2 TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE RESEARCH INTO BOWEL DISEASE AND OTHER CONDITIONS LEADING TO THE REMOVAL OF THE COLON, SURGICAL PROCEDURES PERTAINING THERETO, AND RELATED MATTERS, AND FURTHER TO PROMOTE THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE GAINED BY SUCH RESEARCH; 2.1.3 TO KEEP ILEOSTOMISTS AND OTHERS INFORMED OF ALL MATTERS OF INTEREST TO THE CHARITY BY THE PERIODIC DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION BY WAY OF PUBLICATIONS, BY ARRANGING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND COURSES ON TOPICS OF INTEREST, AND IN ANY OTHER MANNER WHICH IS CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ileostomy & Internal Pouch
Support Group
Danehurst Court
35-37 West Street
ROCHFORD
SS4 1BE
- Phone:
- 0800 0184724
- Email:
- info@iasupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window