COVENTRY IQRAA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are dealing with kids and adult from disadvanteg community by provid them with after school classes,and weekend classes helping there leasons.and cultural.religion.we work with police by doing seminer about drugs.untsocial behaviours and many more seminers are coming
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 01 August 2017: Standard registration
- 31 May 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 31 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1184150 COVENTRY IQRA TRUST UK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.67k | £102.92k | £1.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.05k | £8.51k | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2016 as amended on 28 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE TO IMPROVE THE PROSPECTS AND LIFE OPPORTUNITIES OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS THROUGH THE DELIVERY OF AFTERSCHOOL PROVISION, ADULT EDUCATION CLASSES AND TRADITIONAL TEACHING. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN INCREASED RANGE OF AFFORDABLE, ACCESSIBLE AND CULTURAL APPROPRIATE ARTS WORKSHOPS, TASTER SESSIONS AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES IN COMMUNITY SETTINGS, PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF CREATIVITY AND ARTISTIC TALENT THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SIGNPOSTING ENABLING THE DEVELOPMENT OF LIFESKILLS AND AN IMPROVED UNDERSTANDING OF A CITIZENS ENTITLEMENTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES AND CREATING PROJECT BASED VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO MAKE AN ACTIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SPORT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED ACCESS TO ORGANISED SPORTS TRAINING SESSIONS, COACHING, SPORTS EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES ENCOURAGING PHYSICAL ACTIVITY LEADING TO IMPROVED HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window