FRIENDS OF ONCHAN PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise community events to increase the public profile of Onchan Park. To raise funds to regenerate the park and it's facilities for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON CLAIRE PRITCHARD | Chair | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valeria Puddu | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PIA ALIMONTI | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEELAGH CARNEY | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TERRENCE POLLARD | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIA ROBINSON | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £843 | £487 | £737 | £1.85k | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £189 | £96 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 June 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 June 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 332 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARLTON, NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF ONCHAN PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 ONCHAN DRIVE
CARLTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG4 1DB
- Phone:
- 07763399330
- Email:
- parkonchan@gmail.com
- Website:
-
onchanpark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window