TOM DALE COMPANY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tom Dale Company is one of the UK's leading contemporary dance companies. By combining dance, electronic music & digital media, TDC is a leader in the field producing world-class work which is simultaneously bold, exciting & constantly evolving. Our award-winning participatory activities enable engagement with dance & digital technology and is a core strand for the company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £160,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN MICHAEL HOCTOR | Chair | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hale | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Taylor | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Munn | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Stoddart | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sooree Pillay | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.55k | £141.52k | £248.58k | £273.34k | £214.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227.48k | £129.22k | £210.55k | £243.28k | £259.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | £3.00k | £160.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE PERFORMANCE ART OF DANCE; AND TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OR BENEVOLENT PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPACE 2
2 DAKEYNE STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG3 2AR
- Phone:
- 07967188853
- Email:
- hello@tomdale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window