The Ugly Duckling Charity

Charity Number: 1173156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

UDC is a Christian organisation that creates resources that can be used by people of all ages to explore life in all its fullness. We equip people in numerous contexts to have life changing conversations and explore the foundations of living life well; supporting them to look after their well-being (body, mind and soul) and to find purpose and meaning in life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £39,788
Total expenditure: £77,470

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 2017: CIO registration
  • 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1067753 THE UGLY DUCKLING COMPANY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE UGLY DUCKLING COMPANY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DAVID MARC OWEN Chair 24 May 2017
THE WELSH BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
MORIAH BAPTIST CHURCH RISCA
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST MISSIONARY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE GWENT BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
WALESWIDE CYMRUGYFAN
Recently registered
Keith Howick Trustee 11 July 2018
ST PAUL'S BECKENHAM PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE ELEANOR FOUNDATION (UK)
Received: On time
TULSE HILL & DULWICH HOCKEY CLUB LIMITED
Received: 34 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S BECKENHAM
Received: On time
GRAHAM ALEXANDER MCGILL Trustee 24 May 2017
ST MADOC CHRISTIAN YOUTH CAMP
Received: On time
KEYHOPE
Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
PARKLANDS EVANGELICAL CHURCH CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £106.35k £74.37k £85.47k £130.11k £39.79k
Total expenditure £103.72k £101.22k £108.44k £95.91k £77.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Ugly Duckling Charity
124 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
Phone:
07799831525