Financial history Commonwealth Sport Foundation

Charity number: 1173238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £515.00k £1.30m £1.88m £333.10k £558.54k
Total expenditure £278.00k £361.54k £1.38m £1.75m £418.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £221.97k N/A
Income from government grants £515.00k £1.30m £1.78m N/A £55.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £515.00k £0 £1.88m N/A £503.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £55.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £278.00k £361.54k £1.38m N/A £375.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A £35.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £43.22k £1.38m N/A £45.19k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £42.88k