DHAKADAKSHIN UNNOYON SHONGSTHA (UK)

Charity number: 1173805
Charity reporting is up to date (219 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advice information and guidance to the users; supplementary and mother education classes for the disadvantaged pupils; donations to the poor and marginalized people in the community. Elderly and pensioners club for the elderly in the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £13,414
Total expenditure: £10,850

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Bangladesh

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DHAKA DAKSHIN UNNOYON SHANGSTHA UK (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YAMEEM RUHUL HOSSAIN DEEDAR Trustee 13 October 2019
MUSLIM EDUCATION AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (GUILDFORD)
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Mohammad Shamim Ahmad Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Muhammad Noor Uddin Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2019 30/10/2020 30/10/2021 30/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £16.42k £6.10k £7.93k £9.61k £13.41k
Total expenditure £12.20k £4.60k £7.91k £11.50k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 07 April 2025 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2022 18 January 2024 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2021 11 October 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2020 12 May 2022 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Avenue Close
LONDON
N14 4BJ
Phone:
+447723606936