NIRVAIR KHALSA JATHA UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO seeks to educate the general public of the relevance of Sikhism in their lives. The beneficiaries are normally exposed to many facets of modern life that they may find difficult in reconciling with the basic tenets of the Sikh faith. Partnership with other charities will enhance the learning of the Sikh scriptures and tenets allowing equal opportunities within the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Thailand
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.51k | £206.58k | £116.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.64k | £117.26k | £92.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 100 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 April 2021 | 444 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 19 April 2021 | 444 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 29 AUG 2017 AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF THE SIKH FAITH ESPECIALLY AS THEY RELATE TO YOUNGER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHOSE NATIVE LANGUAGE IS NOT THAT OF THE SIKH SCRIPTURES. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE IRRESPECTIVE OF THE CREED, GENDER OR RACE OF THE PERSON IN NEED BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND THROUGH SERVICES AND OTHER INITIATIVES COMPATIBLE WITH SIKHISM EITHER DIRECTLY TO INDIVIDUALS OR TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 3) TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE IRRESPECTIVE OF THE CREED GENDER OR RACE OF THE PERSON IN NEED THROUGH ENGAGING WITH INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE DIRECT SERVICES OR ADVICE COMPATIBLE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF SIKHISM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window