ASHTON UNDER HILL SOCIAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help promote social and sporting activities within the community of Ashton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 23 April 1980: Standard registration
- ASHTON UNDER HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES BAYLIS | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Swindells | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.37k | £2.80k | £17.43k | £19.37k | £6.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £4.08k | £5.03k | £20.36k | £8.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £730 | N/A | £10.50k | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2024 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16 JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND AND COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ASHTON UNDER HILL AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASHTON UNDER HILL AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cotswold View
Playing Fields Lane
Elmley Road
Ashton-under-Hill
EVESHAM
WR11 7RF
- Phone:
- 01386881548
- Email:
- treasurer@auhsc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window