GREYHOUND LIFELINE

Charity number: 1173175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote humane behaviour toward greyhounds by accepting them into our care, rehabilitating & finding homes for greyhounds. We educate the public in matters pertaining to greyhound welfare & raise awareness through events, the internet & fundraising activities that greyhounds make ideal pets. We support local community groups & charities through offering education & therapeutic activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £86,589
Total expenditure: £63,436

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUCY ANNETTE QUARENDON Chair 17 February 2017
None on record
MARIE HELEN HARRIS Trustee 17 February 2017
None on record
MARINA TIMMS Trustee 17 February 2017
None on record
MR CHRIS BAKER Trustee 17 February 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.96k £72.54k £73.33k £54.26k £86.59k
Total expenditure £28.35k £50.13k £43.46k £101.96k £63.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
49 COXFORD ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 5FG
Phone:
07828138378