THE CARDIGAN COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SHOW SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To prmote and advance for the benefit of the public, agriculture, horticulture and forestry and to promote the improvement of livestock and prevention and eradication of diseases in animals useful to humankind and in particular in the area of Cardigan and District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £250 from 250 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 28 May 1980: Standard registration
- THE CARDIGAN AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SHOW SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Alwyn James Evans | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eiros Edwards | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
John James Williams | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GARETH LEWIS | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|||||
MR LYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DAVID HARRIES WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/11/2019 | 28/11/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.08k | £39.49k | £289.20k | £80.30k | £221.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.11k | £111.67k | £22.89k | £316.47k | £62.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.39k | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 November 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 November 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 6 MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND FORESTRY AND TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF LIVESTOCK, AND THE PREVENTION AND ERADICATION OF DISEASES IN ANIMALS USEFUL TO MAN AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF CARDIGAN AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
CARDIGAN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROYAN HOUSE
PRIORY STREET
CARDIGAN
CEREDIGION
SA43 1BZ
- Phone:
- 01239612467
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window