THE RAWSON HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide modern, affordable recreational and leisure facilities, through the provision and maintenance of a village hall for the people and parish of Bolney regardless of gender, race or orientation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £520 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 June 2017: CIO registration
- 13 May 2018: Funds received from 305173 THE RAWSON HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Grania Delves | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Newcocmb | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mullany | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Sands | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BEATTIE | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Bridger | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HAZEL | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON HOLLANDS | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL WALKER | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANE GARDNER | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.43k | £39.49k | £61.82k | £52.01k | £64.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.12k | £34.50k | £47.98k | £44.92k | £46.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.63k | £20.87k | £2.67k | £520 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TE PARISH OF BOLNEY, WEST SUSSEX (THE"AREAOF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rawson Hall
The Street
Bolney
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH17 5PF
- Phone:
- 01444 881835
- Email:
- info@rawsonhallbolney.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window