THE ROCKS LANE SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting community participation in healthy recreation in Barnes, Chiswick, Fulham and the surrounding area by providing facilities and resources to enable all people, regardless of age, financial hardship or physical disability, to participate in sports capable of improving health and fitness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS WARREN | Chair | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nassim Lagraa | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CROSSLEY WRIGHT | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN THOSE PARTS OF LONDON IN WHICH THE CIO AN OPERATE (INITIALLY SOUTH, WEST AND CENTRAL LONDON) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND RESOURCES TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTS WHICH ARE CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREAS MENTIONED ABOVE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 EDWARDES SQUARE
LONDON
W8 6HE
- Phone:
- 07768730300
- Email:
- chris@rockslane.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window