UNITY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday and midweek worship; youth and family work, including Stepping Stones (parents and toddlers) and family afternoons; pastoral care; Lifeline Debt Advice; Foodbank; Pantry. Hire of premises to outside groups; Craft and Chat group; Wesley Guild; House Groups; Social events (Saturday Cafe, community lunches, Sunday lunches, church bowls group); Justice and Peace Group; fundraising; donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 21 June 2017: Standard registration
- WESLEY AVENUE METHODIST CHURCH, SANDBACH (Working name)
- SANDBACH METHODIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Carolyn Ann Lawrance | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Christine Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cornel Hanna | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Trinder | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Kelly | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Joyce Stolworthy | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Katy Louise Lowe | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Doreen Cieka | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Marian Pauline Sherwin | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE LORRELLA BUNN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Timothy Cooke | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL CHARLES GLASSONBURY | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Foster | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAVID PARKER-AIKEN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN HORSFIELD | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
GEORGE ALAN PIMLOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
BRUNILDA EYRE | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.87k | £89.38k | £105.39k | £155.75k | £174.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.78k | £94.54k | £128.06k | £137.26k | £182.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932 as amended on 21 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
SECTION 4 METHODIST CHURCH ACT 1976 THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE PURPOSES DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION BEING A SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH;
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESLEY CENTRE
16 CHAPEL STREET
SANDBACH
CW11 1DS
- Phone:
- 01270750078
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window