POW THANET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A mixed arts festival of work mainly by women in and around Thanet, Kent, with a year-round programme of arts-led community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £6,250 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 04 October 2017: CIO registration
- POW! THANET (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alaina Crystal | Chair | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Clissold-Lesser | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Stevie Tyler | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Schulz | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eilidh Macpherson | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lara Wilks Sloane | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nena Foster | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.67k | £98.97k | £156.22k | £122.51k | £137.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.66k | £83.60k | £138.17k | £133.77k | £129.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.10k | £12.52k | £7.37k | £3.70k | £6.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2017 as amended on 02 May 2023 as amended on 02 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- (A) PROMOTING AND STAGING AN ANNUAL ARTS FESTIVAL TO COMMEMORATE INTERNATIONAL WOMEN’S DAY; (B) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY OF WOMEN AND GIRLS (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING GENERAL AWARENESS AMONG THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND CHALLENGES FACING THE LIVES OF WOMEN AND GIRLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
POW Thanet c/o Kemps Accounting Solutions Ltd
42A High Street
BROADSTAIRS
Kent
CT10 1JT
- Phone:
- 07834081787
- Email:
- info@powthanet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window