CHASDEI ESTHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of orthodox Jewish religion, orthodox Jewish religious education and education in general and in particular (but not exclusively) by making grants to and supporting the charitable activities of schools, organisations and other charities both in the UK and worldwide.The relief of poverty, sickness and infirmity among persons of the Jewish faith residing in both the UK and worlwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 09 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABBI PINTER | Chair | 08 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Pinchos Pinter | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|||||
DOVID HALBERSTAM | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.40k | £206.39k | £241.02k | £291.29k | £255.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.91k | £205.47k | £226.10k | £285.79k | £258.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION, ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND EDUCATION IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY MAKING GRANTS TO AND SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF SCHOOLS, ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER CHARITIES BOTH IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY AMONG PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH RESIDING IN BOTH THE UK AND WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING ANY CHARITABLE MEANS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Raffingers LLP
19-20 Bourne Court
Southend Road
Woodford Green
Essex
IG8 8HD
- Phone:
- 07940492429
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window