NEWCASTLE BENFIELD JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in Newcastle upon Tyne and its surrinding areas in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of youth football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 19 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Lumsdon | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Faetz | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICKY EVANS | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.01k | £93.51k | £84.98k | £110.38k | £202.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.00k | £74.86k | £88.43k | £112.82k | £143.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 04 May 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF YOUTH FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newcastle Benfield Juniors FC
Sam Smiths Park
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Tyne and Wear
NE6 4NU
- Phone:
- 07818436301
- Email:
- info@benfieldjuniors.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window