MEN IN SHEDS BEDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the preservation and protection of Men's good health in the Bedford area for the public benefit. In particular but not limited to those who are retired, unemployed or have health problems through the provision of facilities for hobbies, recreation or other leisure time and practical interests, skills sharing, learning of new skills and help with community projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
Governance
- 23 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Mulhall | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Stephen Howard Conway B Sc Hons | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Clare | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Warwick Holden | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ken Baddley | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £2.81k | £6.62k | £5.81k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59k | £2.56k | £377 | £7.51k | £6.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £700 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 20 August 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 22 October 2021 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF (PRIMARILY) MEN'S GOOD HEALTH IN THE BEDFORD AREA, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED, UNEMPLOYED OR HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HOBBIES, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS INCLUDING PRACTICAL INTERESTS, SKILLS SHARING, THE LEARNING OF NEW SKILLS, AND HELPING WITH OTHER COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O BEDFORD ARTS & CRAFTS CENTRE
AMPTHILL ROAD
BEDFORD
MK429HE
- Phone:
- 07592 483336
- Email:
- meninshedsbedford@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window