Financial history THE SAFEGUARDING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £2.50k £2.63k £2.80k £4.07k
Total expenditure £4.50k £2.50k £2.70k £2.74k £4.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A