Financial history EDGELANDS ARTS

Charity number: 1173773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.47k £69.64k £93.87k £85.22k £15.90k
Total expenditure £93.59k £47.19k £90.15k £70.22k £45.47k
Income from government contracts £30.63k £7.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.26k £36.26k £43.52k N/A