Financial history WESTIE RESCUE UK (WRUK)

Charity number: 1173538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/06/2020 21/06/2021 21/06/2022 21/06/2023 21/06/2024
Total gross income £24.70k £51.57k £31.48k £17.09k £18.01k
Total expenditure £24.30k £34.89k £32.72k £29.39k £33.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A