COMMUNITY INTEREST LUTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Interest Luton provides various projects throughout Luton, Bedfordshire. Providing support towards employment, better health, taking people out of poverty. We have a the Luton Employabilty Training and Skills Hub/Fairs supporting those seeking a job, Curry Kitchen supporting the homeless, Community mens gym and a womens gym, improving their health, taking them out of social isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Luton
Governance
- 15 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOSTAQUE AHMED KOYES | Chair | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shanique Samuels | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mehvish Bismal | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DONNA LOUISE DWYER | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
AIMEE JADE CLARKE | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.48k | £193.75k | £124.03k | £170.78k | £159.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.23k | £187.30k | £121.95k | £185.96k | £125.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.19k | £16.00k | £4.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES IN LUTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY: - ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF VOCATIONAL AND LIFELONG LEARNING AND OTHER ACTIVITIES IN SUCH FORMS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT. - ADVANCING THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES THAT HAVE A PROVEN BENEFICIAL EFFECT ON HEALTH AND HAVE THEMES OF SOCIAL IMPORTANCE AND RELEVANCE. - TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; AND (B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 ALEXANDRA AVENUE
LUTON
LU3 1HG
- Phone:
- 07763990080
- Email:
- aimee@ciluton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window