Financial history CEEBEE GOLD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.87k £52.33k £56.11k £29.62k £37.39k
Total expenditure £7.92k £50.36k £52.69k £35.57k £27.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £26.00k N/A