ILM TREE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation runs a weekend/evening supplementary school providing children aged 4-14 with Islamic and character education. The educational program consists of three broad subject areas. 1) the acquisition of classical Arabic, 2) secondly a moral and spiritual education 3) children learn the importance of community, citizenship and how to give back to the society/community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 10 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUHAIL AKRAM | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUBNA RASHID | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.74k | £27.18k | £16.70k | £12.90k | £22.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.47k | £24.85k | £18.77k | £11.95k | £21.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2023 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2023 | 730 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2023 | 1095 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2023 | 1095 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ISLAMIC EDUCATION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF LECTURES, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 30
Batley Business Park
Technology Drive
BATLEY
West Yorkshire
WF17 6ER
- Phone:
- 07852558050
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window