NIDA' ALKHAYRIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is based on UK but is operating in Yemen and MiddleEast. Its main activities is to distribute food to poor families and people in need and to provide appropriate shelter for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
- Yemen
Governance
- 26 June 2017: CIO registration
- NIDA' ALKHARIN (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMMED | Chair | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moaath Al-Namari | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mazen Al-Namari | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RANIA ABDALKHALEK | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KHALTOOM MOQBIL | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
HUSSEIN NASHIR | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.14k | £24.08k | £19.32k | £15.62k | £20.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84k | £23.57k | £18.65k | £14.87k | £17.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN YEMEN 2.TO PROVIDE MEDICAL ASSISTANCE TO POVERTY STRICKEN AREAS OF YEMEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 NORTH QUADRANT
SHEFFIELD
S5 6NT
- Phone:
- 07733402222
- Email:
- info@alkhayrin.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window