CHANDLER'S FORD CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1173997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chaplains visit workplaces by agreement to provide a listening ear and confidential*, non-judgemental support to anyone who requests it. Chaplains may signpost to services/ organisations which they consider might be of benefit. The service is free, and aims to also build bridges within the local community . It is restricted to Chandler's Ford. *except where there is a safe guarding concern.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £400
Total expenditure: £37

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CHANDLER'S FORD WORKPLACE CHAPLAINCY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADRIAN RALPH NANCE Trustee 28 July 2017
WINGS LIKE EAGLES
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
DAVID GREGORY WRIGHTON Trustee 28 July 2017
CHANDLER'S FORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SOUTHAMPTON VOLUNTARY SERVICES
Received: On time
SOUTHAMPTON ADVICE & REPRESENTATION CENTRE
Received: On time
SPRINGBOARD EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING GROUP
Received: 47 days late
PAULA LOUISE GLEESON Trustee 28 July 2017
None on record
JACQUELINE HILARY RICHARDSON Trustee 28 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £200 £200 £0 £150 £400
Total expenditure £314 £192 £75 £235 £37
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 25 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 25 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 25 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 10 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 12 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PARISH OFFICE
HURSLEY ROAD
CHANDLER'S FORD
EASTLEIGH
HAMPSHIRE
SO53 2FT
Phone:
07906686183