ADVENTURE HOLIDAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is to provide holidays for needy children from the North East of England who would not otherwise have the opportunity of such a break.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 06 June 2017: CIO registration
- 14 September 2019: Funds received from 266346 ADVENTURE HOLIDAYS LIMITED
- ADVENTURE HOLIDAYS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET JANE MCFADYEN | Chair | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Jordan | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Chart | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CHART | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael George Darrington | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM GARNHAM BA BPhil | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.49k | £14.10k | £17.24k | £5.15k | £10.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.23k | £13.88k | £21.74k | £19.91k | £43.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 06 JUN 2017 AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2017 as amended on 25 Nov 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS ( INCLUDING, IF THOUGHT FIT, PERIODS OF CONVALESCENCE) IN THE NORT EAST OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Farndale Close
BLAYDON-ON-TYNE
Tyne And Wear
NE21 6HH
- Phone:
- 07712650421
- Email:
- jane.mcfadyen@adhols.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window