BRADLEY STOKE EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1176613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The church aims to introduce people to the love of God shown through Jesus Christ and to demonstrate that love in practical acts of kindness. We hold regular Sunday worship services and run midweek bible studies, a toddler group, youth groups, and outreach events; all these events are open to all. We also support charitable organisations which seek to advance the Christian faith and relieve need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £156,857
Total expenditure: £163,849

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BSEC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Fraser Peckham Chair 01 September 2024
None on record
Philip Michael Dart Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
David Neill Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
PAUL MARTYN SHADDICK Trustee 10 January 2018
None on record
PETER MUIR Trustee 10 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120.30k £127.72k £138.66k £141.65k £156.86k
Total expenditure £127.42k £125.40k £114.07k £115.77k £163.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bradley Stoke Evangelical Church
Baileys Court Road
Bradley Stoke
BRISTOL
BS32 8BH
Phone:
01179314716