CARE AND DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Care and Development Foundation has been set up to create sustainable means of income for families in the rural areas of Somalia affected by droughts. Our projects include, education and training, drought relief and working towards creating a community less reliant on the depleted livestock.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Somalia
Governance
- 26 July 2017: CIO registration
- CDF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL WAHID HASHI MUSA | Chair | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDULAHI ISSE MUSSE | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
lucy owen | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAHMOUD HASHI MUSA | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: - THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY [OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP] PARTICULARLY IN THE RURAL MUDUG REGION OF SOMALIA (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, JOBS, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. - TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY BY CONDUCTING RESEARCH ON METHODS MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF DROUGHT AND LAND EROSION AND PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MANAGEMENT, USE AND CONSERVATION OF NATURAL RESOURCES. - TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. - TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (BOTH ACADEMIC AND VOCATIONAL) OF PEOPLE [UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS] PARTICULARLY IN RURAL SOMALIA BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Chapelgate
Scholes
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 1SX
- Phone:
- 07729372967
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window