NORFOLK TORTOISE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards tortoises by promoting best practice for tortoise care, providing a rehoming service for tortoises in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances, ill usage ,changed owner circumstances and educating the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 September 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Koren Weyand | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Duckham | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
A J O'connor | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary WHITE | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ray Morter | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Jonathan Rhodes | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Foulger | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Broom | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Tirtasana Chubb | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.03k | £8.07k | £13.43k | £21.29k | £33.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.97k | £9.52k | £18.60k | £24.83k | £34.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS TORTOISES BY PROVIDING A TORTOISE CARE REHOMING SERVICE FOR TORTOISES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mergate Hall
Flordon Road
Bracon Ash
NORWICH
Norfolk
NR14 8DP
- Phone:
- 07511846399
- Email:
- info@tortoiseclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window