Trustees THE BUS SHELTER MK
Charity number: 1173705

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Williams | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Tait | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Armstrong Christie | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stephen Thompson | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Albert Yoofi Clarke | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Rust | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pete Smith | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Pickering | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.