Financial history THE PONTOON TRUST

Charity number: 1172421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £288.64k £2.51m £1.44m £82.29k £3.33m
Total expenditure £288.64k £2.51m £1.44m £1.46m £3.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.40m £2.40m N/A £4.40m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £3.40m £2.40m N/A £3.52m
Income - Investment N/A £55.60k £52.39k N/A £227.44k
Income - Other N/A £0 £1.39m N/A £3.10m
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £2.51m £1.44m N/A £3.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.42k £7.58k N/A £7.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £2.50m £1.43m N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0