GREEN STREET GREEN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the Greenwood Community Centre for use by: A pre-school/nursery Various local community groups, such as Trefoil Guild, Yoga classes, Martial Arts classes, Coleen Man Dance Academy, Phoenix Flower group, Weightwatchers, Kentish Opera, Sacred Sanctuary Church Children's and family parties Community events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 20 April 2017: CIO registration
- GREEN STREET GREEN ASSOCIATION. (Working name)
- GREEN STREET GREEN VILLAGE SOCIETY (Working name)
- GREENWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Juana Kabba | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yeside Adebiyi | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margot Frances Rohan | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.02k | £16.32k | £92.10k | £18.83k | £18.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.89k | £19.75k | £36.42k | £36.82k | £41.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 20 APR 2017 AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2018 as amended on 22 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREEN STREET GREEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWOOD CENTRE
4 HIGH STREET
GREEN STREET GREEN
ORPINGTON
BR6 6BQ
- Phone:
- 07710356964
- Email:
- GSGAssn@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window