YEMEN RELIEF (UK) LTD

Charity Number: 1175659
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit, the relief and assistance of people in need in Yemen, who are the victims of war and/or victims of natural disasters by supplying them with food, shelter, medicine, clean water, educational materials and other relief items

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £166,842
Total expenditure: £157,621

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Bristol City
  • Cardiff
  • City Of London
  • City Of Swansea
  • Liverpool City
  • Manchester City
  • Newport City
  • Sheffield City
  • Warrington
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • YEMEN RELIEF (UK) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALI SAIF LLB , DBA Chair 10 November 2016
None on record
Lamees Tahir Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
USAMA SHAMSAN Trustee 06 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £22.64k £133.49k £431.08k £288.56k £166.84k
Total expenditure £22.44k £119.54k £423.41k £308.86k £157.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 29 November 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 29 November 2024 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 02 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 12 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 ELEANOR PLACE
CARDIFF
CF10 5BJ
Phone:
02921321060