GLOSSOP CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1173405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music in all its aspects, primarily by presenting public concerts and recitals

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £30,044
Total expenditure: £40,682

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Zuntz Chair 26 October 2021
None on record
Marion Joy Barter Trustee 23 July 2024
None on record
Priscilla Frances Mary Hollman Trustee 28 June 2024
None on record
Charlotte Elizabeth Cotterill Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Christopher John Strogen Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Carl Allen Raven Trustee 26 October 2021
None on record
Professor Samuel Richard Griffiths-Jones Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £34.17k £11.69k £3.49k £22.19k £30.04k
Total expenditure £30.50k £11.47k £868 £21.90k £40.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A N/A N/A £3.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 12 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 13 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DAVIES BLANK FURNISS
10 ELLISON STREET
GLOSSOP
SK13 8BZ
Phone:
07879646704