Financial history THE U.K. FRIENDS OF CENTRALESUPÉLEC

Charity Number: 1172405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £28.20k £72.70k £39.92k £64.27k £384.33k
Total expenditure £4.69k £3.69k £100.63k £5.71k £370.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A