Accounts and annual returns TEEM Clinton

Charity number: 510026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required