TEEM Clinton

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fundraise by holding events such as Christmas and Spring Fairs, Fashion Show, Auction Night and Variety Night. All events have been organised by a team of parents, teachers and friends of the school whom give their time voluntarily.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 May 1980: Standard registration
- 04 May 2019: Funds received from 1081480 FRIENDS OF CLINTON PRIMARY SCHOOL ORCHESTRA
- CLINTON SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma-Jane Pointon | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Grafke | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Edwards | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Thomas Pointon | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.52k | £7.40k | £9.82k | £12.46k | £11.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.32k | £6.94k | £9.23k | £15.34k | £2.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 23 APRIL 1980 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 1984. as amended on 11 Mar 2019 as amended on 23 Oct 2019 as amended on 12 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL BY : A) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND CARERS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL IN ENHANCING AND ENRICHING THE EDUCATION OF ITS PUPILS AND C) RAISING THE PROFILE OF THE SCHOOL WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO WORK WITHIN THE COMMUNITY FOR MUTUAL BENEFIT AND D) PROVIDING FUNDS TO MAINTAIN THE SCHOOL ORCHESTRA AND E) PROVIDING RESOURCES THAT FACILITATE MUSIC MAKING, WATCHING LIVE PERFORMANCES AND PARTICIPATING IN INSPIRING EXPERIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLINTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
CAESAR ROAD
KENILWORTH
CV8 1DL
- Phone:
- 01926852334
- Email:
- teemclinton@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window