Governing document TEEM Clinton

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 23 APRIL 1980 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 1984. as amended on 11 Mar 2019 as amended on 23 Oct 2019 as amended on 12 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL BY : A) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND CARERS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL IN ENHANCING AND ENRICHING THE EDUCATION OF ITS PUPILS AND C) RAISING THE PROFILE OF THE SCHOOL WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO WORK WITHIN THE COMMUNITY FOR MUTUAL BENEFIT AND D) PROVIDING FUNDS TO MAINTAIN THE SCHOOL ORCHESTRA AND E) PROVIDING RESOURCES THAT FACILITATE MUSIC MAKING, WATCHING LIVE PERFORMANCES AND PARTICIPATING IN INSPIRING EXPERIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.