HARPENDEN CONNECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harpenden Connect is the charity set up to run a new volunteer operated hail and ride Harpenden Hopper community bus service, serving areas of the town with little or no commercial bus services. A second Hopper bus will be used to take the elderly and disadvantaged on trips helping to combat isolation and provide a social outlet for those who are seldom able to get out for pure enjoyment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Cooke | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Hart | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew James Buchanan | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geoff Newman | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
TERESA CATHERINE HERITAGE | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £5.40k | £12.32k | £13.91k | £19.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.12k | £7.06k | £11.10k | £12.45k | £13.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, OPERATE AND MAINTAIN TRANSPORT FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE IN THE AL5 AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR, DISABLED, PARENTS OR GUARDIANS OF YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING WHERE THERE ARE INADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES AND FOR HIRE TO OTHER GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARPENDEN CONNECT
Vaughan Chambers
Vaughan Road
Harpenden
AL5 4EE
- Phone:
- 01582638007
- Email:
- hopon@harpendenhopper.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window