FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting social justice by providing adults with an excellent learning environment for personal, professional and political development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£2,627,453
Donations and legacies | £10.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.46m | |
Other trading activities | £21.80k | |
Investments | £136.35k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,561,229
Raising funds | £17.29k | |
Charitable activities | £2.54m | |
Other | £0 |
-£155,757 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £163,979 from 3 government contract(s) and £2,204,664 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £17.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.54m | |
Retained for future use | £66.22k |
People

55 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 20 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Kenny | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Jon Shore | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Geoffrey Mark Layer | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Carole Lesley Parkes | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Eluned Griffith Jones | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Robert Masunga | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
Parminder Singh Garcha | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Melanie Lenehan | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28m | £2.85m | £2.65m | £2.49m | £2.63m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25m | £2.60m | £2.50m | £2.34m | £2.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.89m | £2.51m | £2.26m | £2.10m | £163.98k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.39k | £53.28k | £55.96k | £2.20m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.50k | £13.00k | £51.88k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £52.06k | £0 | £0 | £48.12k | £21.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.07m | £2.69m | £2.48m | £2.30m | £2.46m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £145.69k | £131.87k | £120.39k | £132.09k | £136.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £13.55k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.24m | £2.52m | £2.48m | £2.32m | £2.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.01k | £15.20k | £15.80k | £17.11k | £17.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £74.46k | £71.17k | £97.14k | £88.09k | £77.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £16.01k | £15.20k | £15.80k | £17.11k | £17.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £71.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.29m | £2.11m | £2.28m | £2.18m | £2.09m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.76m | £3.76m | £3.94m | £3.68m | £3.70m | |
|
Other assets | £726.27k | £738.38k | £1.22m | £1.08m | £1.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £947.09k | £874.66k | £1.62m | £1.01m | £1.18m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 SEP 1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 MAR 1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 08 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE COLLEGE SHALL, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PROVIDE AND PROMOTE ADULT, FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL EDUCATION AND IN SO DOING IT SHALL : 2.1 SEEK TO ADVANCE SOCIAL JUSTICE; 2.2 SEEK TO WIDEN THE PARTICIPATION OF DISADVANTAGED INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS IN POST COMPULSORY EDUCATION; 2.3 ADDRESS THE TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT NEEDS OF THE VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY SECTOR; 2.4 ENSURE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND CELEBRATE DIVERSITY AMONG THE COLLEGE'S STUDENTS AND STAFF; 2.5 WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROVIDERS; 2.6 MAINTAIN A RANGE OF APPROPRIATE IT AND LEARNING RESOURCES; 2.7 ENCOURAGE THE DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH IN ADULT EDUCATION, INCLUDING PUBLICATIONS AND LECTURES; AND 2.8 SUPPORT FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE CURRICULUM DEVELOPMENT, DELIVERY AND RESEARCH IN ADULT EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRCROFT COLLEGE
1018 BRISTOL ROAD
SELLY OAK
BIRMINGHAM
B29 6LH
- Phone:
- 01214720116
- Email:
- info@fircroft.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window