Accounts and annual returns JORVIK WARRIORS POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1173003

Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 29 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Annual return | 29 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days | |
Annual return | 29 June 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2021 | 22 March 2023 | 327 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 June 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2020 | 22 March 2023 | 692 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window