Accounts and annual returns ALDEBURGH BEACH BOAT TRUST

Charity Number: 1173337
Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2023 410 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 March 2023 410 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 March 2023 775 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 March 2023 775 days late Download Open in new window