GAMBIAN ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There are many activities that take place at the mosque in the form of education and training, support in regards to economic development/employment, community development and recreation. These activities are facilitated through the provision of a building/buildings/facilities/open space, providing the required services and equipment and through the provision of advocacy and advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 25 September 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAMIN YAFFA | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Baba Musa Njie | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malik Oluwafemi Kesington | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
YOUSUF YAFFA | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SANKUNG KONTEH JABBI | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
NAKEBBA TAAL | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.98k | £69.02k | £56.97k | £60.76k | £39.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.17k | £26.25k | £26.75k | £39.35k | £34.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WEST MIDLANDS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 3. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gambian Islamic Community Centre
36A Windmill Lane
SMETHWICK
West Midlands
B66 3EU
- Phone:
- 01212385540
- Email:
- Giccbirmingham@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window