Financial history FRIENDS OF BARNET EARLY YEARS ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1173513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £5.66k £1.19k £114 £0 £6.65k
Total expenditure £4.60k £3.38k £643 £5.88k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A