Financial history THE CUMBRIA CHRISTIAN YOUTH CAMP TRUST

Charity number: 510036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.02k £8.83k £14.64k £23.54k £33.14k
Total expenditure £27.92k £4.30k £13.30k £26.37k £32.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A