INJURY ON DUTY PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the need of retired and serving police officers in hardship or distress who are disabled as a consequence of being injured on duty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 September 2017: CIO registration
- IOD PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- IODPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Wilson | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.83k | £106.94k | £36.86k | £30.97k | £42.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.99k | £26.11k | £95.58k | £33.26k | £15.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 01 SEP 2017 AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2017 as amended on 17 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF RETIRED AND SERVING POLICE OFFICERS IN HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WHO ARE DISABLED AS A CONSEQUENCE OF BEING INJURED ON DUTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
Unit 13
Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Lytchett Matravers
POOLE
- Phone:
- 07546970622
- Email:
- admin@iodpa.org
- Website:
-
iodpa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window